Description: |
Establishments.
Names of military surveyors listed include:
- Francis Assiotti or Assiotte. Minorca. (Marshall, p 37).
- Robert Atkinson. Clerk of Survey Plymouth, 1 July 1760.
- George Ayres or Eyres. Per order 28 March 1760. (Marshall, p 38).
- Richard Barton. Per order 19 December 1738. Deceased, c.1760. (Marshall, p 37).
- John Bennett. Clerk of Survey, Gibraltar, 1 January 1763.
- William Booth. Per order 9 December 1760. (Marshall, p 38).
- William Brazier or Brasier. Per order 19 September 1756, p 47. Deputy Draughtsman at the Tower of London 1 July 1760. (Marshall, p 37).
- James Brinkhurst. Clerk of the Survey, Minorca, 13 February 1763.
- John Caddy. Per order 13 July 1759. (Marshall, p 37).
- Neil Campbell. Clerk of Survey, Woolwich, 1 July 1760.
- John Chamberlayne. Per order 30 May 1760. (Marshall, p 38).
- Thomas Chamberlain. Per order 30 May 1758. (Marshall, p 38).
- Richard Coombes. Per order 3 April 1759. (Marshall, p 37).
- John Delany. Per order 15 December 1764. (Marshall, p 38).
- John P Desmaretz. Captain. Draughtsman, Tower 1 July 1760. (Marshall, p 37).
- John Dixon. Clerk of Surveyors, Portsmouth, 1 July 1760, p 7.
- Andrew Durnford. Per order 30 May 1758. (Marshall, p 38).
- John Edwards. Per order 24 November 1761. (Marshall, p 38).
- John Evelegh. Clerk to Chief Engineer, 1 January 1761. (Marshall, p 37).
- Stephen Fane. Per order 4 December 1759. (Marshall, p 37).
- Caspar Franks. Clerk of Survey, West Florida. Per order in Council 9 May 1764.
- Francis Gould. Per order 7 October 1760. (Marshall, p 38).
- George Haines. Per order 3 August 1753. (Marshall, p 37).
- Charles Holloway. Per order 7 February 1764. Possibly to Royal Engineers. (Marshall, p 38).
- John Johnson. Per order 1 March 1765, promoted. Possibly later in Royal Engineers. (Marshall, p 38).
- James Lillyman. Clerk to Chief Engineer. 1 July 1760 - 31 December 1760. Possibly promoted. 15 August 1760 Ensign Royal Engineers.
- John Macleod. Clerk of Survey, Gibraltar. 1 July 1760 - deceased before 1 January 1763.
- Thomas Masterman. Clerk of Survey, Purfleet. 17 December 1761.
- Henry Mercier. Per order 24 November 1761. (Marshall, p 38).
- Nathaniel Minshall. Per order 3 April 1759. Ensign Royal Engineers, 25 November 1760. (Marshall, p 37).
- Arthur Neil. Clerk of Survey, Sheerness. 1 October 1761 - 30 June 1764. Promoted.
- William Parker. Per order 7 October 1760. (Marshall, p 37).
- Thomas Peckham. Storekeeper at Quebec. 1 October 1763.
- Thomas Peckham. Clerk of Survey, Chatham, 1 July 1760, p 7. Promoted by 1 October 1763.
- John Potter. 1st class. Per order 30 May 1760.
- William Pratt. Per order 3 April 1759. Possibly deceased after 24 November 1761. (Marshall, p 37).
- John Ringe. Per order 6 February 1759. (Marshall, p 37).
- William Saltonstall. Clerk of Survey, Chatham, 1 October 1763.
- Edward Smart. Per order 9 December 1760. (Marshall, p 37).
- Thomas Smart. Per order 9 October 1758. (Marshall, p 37).
- Charles Smith. Per order 2 August 1759. (Marshall, p 38).
- William Stevenson. Per order 20 May 1763. Promoted. (Marshall, p 38).
- James Sumpter. Per order 7 April 1761. (Marshall, p 38).
- William Sumpter. Clerk of Survey, Sheerness. 1 July 1764. (Marshall, p 37).
- William Test. Per order 30 May 1758. (Marshall, p 37).
- John Turner. Per order 30 September 1758. Possibly deceased after 20 May 1763. (Marshall, p 37).
- William Twiss. Per order 21 July 1760. Ensign Royal Engineer, 19 November 1763. (Marshall, p 38).
- John Wade. Per order 27 February 1761. Promoted. Ensign Royal Engineers, 30 January 1765. (Marshall, p 38).
- John Wall. Per order 3 April 1759.
- John Wilks. Per order 1 March 1765. (Marshall, p 38).
- Miles Edward Wilks. Per order 16 December 1763. Promoted. (Marshall, p 38).
- James Lewis Wittwer. Per order 24 November 1761. Ensign Royal Engineers, 18 November 1763. (Marshall, p 38).
|