Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- John Cooke, warrant number 103606. Joined on 19 Jan 1914, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- William Emmanuel Reynolds, warrant number 104266. Joined on 19 Oct 1914, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Alfred Miles, warrant number 105056. Joined on 3 May 1915, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Albert Edward Bush, warrant number 105275. Joined on 24 March 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to Y Division as a PS.
- Walter Edward Brum, warrant number 105288. Joined on 24 March 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to Y Division as a PS.
- Frederick George Braysher, warrant number 105306. Joined on 31 March 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- Raymond Thomas Wynne, warrant number 105313. Joined on 31 March 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- Thomas Buckingham, warrant number 105370. Joined on 14 April 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- William Harry Harris, warrant number 105422. Joined on 21 April 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Samuel Bernard Whitehead, warrant number 105493. Joined on 28 April 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Frederick Mear, warrant number 105604. Joined on 19 May 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Herbert Ernest Withall, warrant number 106291. Joined on 7 Aug 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Arthur Leslie Reynolds, warrant number 107075. Joined on 20 Oct 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Johnty Arthur Bates, warrant number 107114. Joined on 20 Oct 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Thomas William Dickinson, warrant number 107273. Joined on 27 Oct 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Charles Henry James Burt, warrant number 107592. Joined on 10 Nov 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Edward John Fuller, warrant number 107648. Joined on 17 Nov 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Richard Montague Ebbels, warrant number 107811. Joined on 24 Nov 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to Y Division as a PS (CID - 2nd Class).
- Basil Larkin, warrant number 107976. Joined on 8 Dec 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Frank Ballard, warrant number 108146. Joined on 15 Dec 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Thomas Edward Evans, warrant number 108340. Joined on 29 Dec 1919, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Frederick Richard Cottle, warrant number 109718. Joined on 29 March 1920, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Darcy Arthur Meech, warrant number 109959. Joined on 26 April 1920, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Wolseley Stafford Beard, warrant number 110149. Joined on 25 May 1920, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Frederick Edward John Brazier, warrant number 110496. Joined on 3 Aug 1920, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- William Harding Moorhouse, warrant number 110511. Joined on 9 Aug 1920, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Walter Ben Crockford, warrant number 111006. Joined on 22 Nov 1920, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Reginald William Harvey, warrant number 111151. Joined on 13 Dec 1920, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Cyril George Roberts, warrant number 122966. Joined on 29 May 1933, and left on 31 Dec 1945. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
|