Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- William Ernest Edward Stevens, warrant number 113346. Joined on 22 Sept 1924, and left on 4 April 1931. Last posted to L Division as a PC.
- Frederick Harbord, warrant number 96697. Joined on 15 March 1909, and left on 12 April 1931. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Archibald Munro, warrant number 120099. Joined on 5 Aug 1930, and left on 12 April 1931. Last posted to N Division as a PC.
- Aquila Reuben George Williams, warrant number 97487. Joined on 8 Nov 1909, and left on 14 April 1931. Last posted to V Division as a PC.
- Thomas James Hooper, warrant number 100091. Joined on 8 May 1911, and left on 14 April 1931. Last posted to M Division as a PS.
- Ernest George Bampton, warrant number 102165. Joined on 13 Jan 1913, and left on 14 April 1931. Last posted to S Division as a PC.
- Edwin Noel Moreton, warrant number 97755. Joined on 3 Jan 1910, and left on 15 April 1931. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Percy Septimus Huggett, warrant number 105478. Joined on 28 April 1919, and left on 15 April 1931. Last posted to L Division as a PC.
- Francis John William Fielder, warrant number 92633. Joined on 27 Nov 1905, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to M Division as Inspector.
- Joseph Goode, warrant number 94427. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to K Division as a PC.
- Bertram James Harrison, warrant number 94428. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to A Division as a PS.
- Edward James Hartshorn, warrant number 94429. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to X Division as a Station PS.
- Ernest Martin William Johnson, warrant number 94430. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to S Division as a PC.
- Alfred John Moon, warrant number 94438. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to L Division as a PS.
- John Morley, warrant number 94439. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to P Division as a PC.
- Jesse Christopher Reeve, warrant number 94443. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to K Division as a Station PS.
- Walter Thomas Starr, warrant number 94444. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to S Division as a PC.
- Rupert Claud Smith, warrant number 94445. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to W Division as Inspector.
- Walter William Tooth, warrant number 94447. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to G Division as a PS.
- Pearson James Furnell, warrant number 94453. Joined on 15 April 1907, and left on 17 April 1931. Last posted to R Division as a PC.
- Robert Courtenay Edwards, warrant number 120678. Joined on 12 Jan 1931, and left on 18 April 1931. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
|