Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- Arthur Lines, warrant number 84814. Joined on 23 Jan 1899, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to H Division as Inspector.
- Sidney William Metcham, warrant number 91050. Joined on 29 Aug 1904, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to D Division as Inspector.
- Arthur Jones, warrant number 92259. Joined on 21 Aug 1905, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to V Division as a Station PS.
- Frederick Septimus Taylor, warrant number 93586. Joined on 6 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to W Division as Inspector.
- Archibald Andrews, warrant number 93624. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- William John Allen, warrant number 93626. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to J Division as a PC.
- Albert John Austin, warrant number 93627. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to P Division as a PC.
- William James Baker, warrant number 93628. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to F Division as a PC.
- Arthur James Everett, warrant number 93631. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to W Division as a PC.
- Joseph Hoare, warrant number 93636. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to S Division as a Station PS.
- George Hoare, warrant number 93637. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- John Munton, warrant number 93640. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Frederick Thomas Scott, warrant number 93643. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to N Division as a PS.
- William Walker, warrant number 93644. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to Z Division as a PC.
- James Arthur Wright, warrant number 93646. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to S Division as a PS.
- Myles McMorrow, warrant number 93649. Joined on 20 Aug 1906, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to J Division as a PC.
- George Joseph Wooller, warrant number 101202. Joined on 8 April 1912, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to C Division as a PC.
- Kenneth Turner Milbourne Wright, warrant number 120918. Joined on 9 March 1931, and left on 23 Aug 1931. Last posted to B Division as a PC.
- Sidney Thomas Herbert, warrant number 116956. Joined on 14 Nov 1927, and left on 24 Aug 1931. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Percival Frederick Upham, warrant number 120761. Joined on 26 Jan 1931, and left on 24 Aug 1931. Last posted to C Division as a PC.
|