Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- Frederick George Brown, warrant number 78958. Joined on 7 Aug 1893, and left on 18 Jan 1919. Last posted to P Division as a PC.
- Sydney James Harwood, warrant number 93918. Joined on 29 Oct 1906, and left on 18 Jan 1919. Last posted to X Division as a PS.
- Ernest Albert Warwick, warrant number 99725. Joined on 23 Jan 1911, and left on 18 Jan 1919. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- George Alfred Bock, warrant number 103070. Joined on 21 July 1913, and left on 18 Jan 1919. Last posted to R Division as a PC.
- George William Westrip, warrant number 74954. Joined on 25 Nov 1889, and left on 20 Jan 1919. Last posted to Chatham [Dockyard] as a PC.
- William John Scott, warrant number 76120. Joined on 1 Sept 1890, and left on 20 Jan 1919. Last posted to Chatham [Dockyard] as a PS.
- Sydney George Ball, warrant number 76835. Joined on 8 June 1891, and left on 20 Jan 1919. Last posted to Portsmouth [Dockyard] as a PC.
- Herbert Henry Styles, warrant number 79201. Joined on 11 Dec 1893, and left on 20 Jan 1919. Last posted to B Division as Inspector.
- Henry Richard Latter, warrant number 85965. Joined on 29 Jan 1900, and left on 20 Jan 1919. Last posted to A Division as a PS.
- Alfred Jennings, warrant number 89129. Joined on 20 Oct 1902, and left on 20 Jan 1919. Last posted to P Division as a PC.
- Henry William Rose, warrant number 91865. Joined on 29 May 1905, and left on 20 Jan 1919. Last posted to C Division as a PS.
- George Henry Varley, warrant number 104847. Joined on 8 Feb 1915, and left on 20 Jan 1919. Last posted to Woolwich [Dockyard] as a PC.
- Jersey Peck, warrant number 79044. Joined on 4 Sept 1893, and left on 21 Jan 1919. Last posted to N Division as a PC.
- Samuel George Warner, warrant number 87556. Joined on 24 June 1901, and left on 21 Jan 1919. Last posted to Chatham [Dockyard] as a PC.
- William Benjamin Stacey, warrant number 76509. Joined on 19 Jan 1891, and left on 22 Jan 1919. Last posted to S Division as a PC.
- Edward Howson, warrant number 78046. Joined on 19 Sept 1892, and left on 22 Jan 1919. Last posted to K Division as a PC.
- William Shepherd, warrant number 88260. Joined on 17 Feb 1902, and left on 22 Jan 1919. Last posted to N Division as a PS.
- Frank Carey, warrant number 98480. Joined on 6 June 1910, and left on 23 Jan 1919. Last posted to F Division as a PC.
- John Henry Philip Stokes, warrant number 103027. Joined on 7 July 1913, and left on 23 Jan 1919. Last posted to E Division as a PC.
- Francis Curl, warrant number 86167. Joined on 2 April 1900, and left on 25 Jan 1919. Last posted to CO Division as a PS.
|