Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- Frederick Horatio Wilson, warrant number 57589. Joined on 9 Feb 1874, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to Chatham [Dockyard] as a PC.
- Josiah Bradbrook, warrant number 57807. Joined on 20 April 1874, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to S Division as a PS.
- John Clements, warrant number 58643. Joined on 8 Feb 1875, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to V Division as Inspector.
- John Eldridge, warrant number 58779. Joined on 22 March 1875, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to N Division as a PC.
- George William Seabright, warrant number 58825. Joined on 5 April 1875, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to B Division as a Sub Divisional Inspector.
- Charles Savill, warrant number 58880. Joined on 19 April 1875, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to V Division as a PC.
- William John Donnelly, warrant number 58883. Joined on 19 April 1875, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to V Division as a PC.
- Alexander Brice Chalk, warrant number 76438. Joined on 22 Dec 1890, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to K Division as a PC.
- William Albert Beaumont, warrant number 83511. Joined on 3 Jan 1898, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to T Division as a PC.
- Alfred George Harland, warrant number 85625. Joined on 23 Oct 1899, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to R Division as a PC.
- John Henry Burson, warrant number 85939. Joined on 22 Jan 1900, and left on 23 April 1900. Last posted to K Division as a PC.
- Walter Butlin, warrant number 83595. Joined on 24 Jan 1898, and left on 24 April 1900. Last posted to N Division as a PC.
- George William Boast, warrant number 84277. Joined on 1 Aug 1898, and left on 24 April 1900. Last posted to B Division as a PC.
- Ernest Robert Clarke, warrant number 84364. Joined on 22 Aug 1898, and left on 24 April 1900. Last posted to S Division as a PC.
- Charles Jackson, warrant number 59698. Joined on 6 Dec 1875, and left on 26 April 1900. Last posted to H Division as a PC.
- Thomas Arney, warrant number 66207. Joined on 23 Jan 1882, and left on 26 April 1900. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- Edwin Mark Benjamin Bond, warrant number 74434. Joined on 29 April 1889, and left on 26 April 1900. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Job Smith, warrant number 67059. Joined on 14 Aug 1882, and left on 27 April 1900. Last posted to W Division as a PC.
|