Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- Thomas Brunning, warrant number 47459. Joined on 6 Aug 1866, and left on 12 Sept 1892. Last posted to B Division as Inspector.
- John Brogan, warrant number 47469. Joined on 6 Aug 1866, and left on 12 Sept 1892. Last posted to L Division as a PS CID.
- George Dowty, warrant number 47475. Joined on 13 Aug 1866, and left on 12 Sept 1892. Last posted to B Division as Inspector.
- John Chapple, warrant number 48470. Joined on 27 May 1867, and left on 12 Sept 1892. Last posted to S Division as a PC.
- David J Francis, warrant number 48603. Joined on 24 June 1867, and left on 12 Sept 1892. Last posted to TA Division as Inspector.
- Thomas P Bodfish, warrant number 48769. Joined on 12 Aug 1867, and left on 12 Sept 1892. Last posted to T Division as a PC.
- William Dring, warrant number 48781. Joined on 12 Aug 1867, and left on 12 Sept 1892. Last posted to T Division as a PC.
- John Wixon, warrant number 48783. Joined on 12 Aug 1867, and left on 12 Sept 1892. Last posted to T Division as a PC.
- Thomas Gunner, warrant number 52896. Joined on 18 July 1870, and left on 12 Sept 1892. Last posted to N Division as a PC.
- Henry W Traill, warrant number 76463. Joined on 22 Dec 1890, and left on 13 Sept 1892. Last posted to N Division as a PC.
- John Tozer, warrant number 75076. Joined on 6 Jan 1890, and left on 15 Sept 1892. Last posted to Chatham [Dockyard] as a PC.
- Thomas Mowbray, warrant number 71988. Joined on 2 Aug 1886, and left on 16 Sept 1892. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- Edward Curran, warrant number 77091. Joined on 26 Oct 1891, and left on 16 Sept 1892. Last posted to E Division as a PC.
- John McKay, warrant number 65137. Joined on 27 Dec 1880, and left on 17 Sept 1892. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- Fred E Gibbins, warrant number 77033. Joined on 31 Aug 1891, and left on 17 Sept 1892. Last posted to C Division as a PC.
- Joseph Wilkes, warrant number 47437. Joined on 30 July 1866, and left on 19 Sept 1892. Last posted to G Division as a PS.
- Andrew O'Shee, warrant number 48789. Joined on 12 Aug 1867, and left on 19 Sept 1892. Last posted to F Division as a PC.
- Benjamin Thorpe, warrant number 48792. Joined on 12 Aug 1867, and left on 19 Sept 1892. Last posted to G Division as a PC.
|