Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- James Counihan, warrant number 47790. Joined on 26 Nov 1866, and left on 1 Feb 1892. Last posted to W Division as a PC.
- Alfred Brook, warrant number 47816. Joined on 3 Dec 1866, and left on 1 Feb 1892. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- Thomas Dove, warrant number 47919. Joined on 24 Dec 1866, and left on 1 Feb 1892. Last posted to P Division as a PS.
- James Anderson, warrant number 47935. Joined on 31 Dec 1866, and left on 1 Feb 1892. Last posted to Y Division as Inspector.
- Alfred G Walker, warrant number 74951. Joined on 18 Nov 1889, and left on 3 Feb 1892. Last posted to H Division as a PC.
- William Oakley, warrant number 58668. Joined on 15 Feb 1875, and left on 4 Feb 1892. Last posted to J Division as a PC.
- George T Carroll, warrant number 68597. Joined on 20 Aug 1883, and left on 4 Feb 1892. Last posted to K Division as a PC.
- Henry Batchelor, warrant number 68515. Joined on 6 Aug 1883, and left on 5 Feb 1892. Last posted to P Division as a PC.
- Thomas Ryan, warrant number 74810. Joined on 7 Oct 1889, and left on 5 Feb 1892. Last posted to E Division as a PC.
- Frederick G Abberline, warrant number 43519. Joined on 5 Jan 1863, and left on 8 Feb 1892. Last posted to CO Division as a Chief Inspector.
- William Elliott, warrant number 45338. Joined on 17 Oct 1864, and left on 8 Feb 1892. Last posted to C Division as Inspector.
- Jonathan Finbow, warrant number 45747. Joined on 13 Feb 1865, and left on 8 Feb 1892. Last posted to A Division as a PC.
- John Roberts, warrant number 46695. Joined on 13 Nov 1865, and left on 8 Feb 1892. Last posted to X Division as a Sub Inspector.
- Jame Clark, warrant number 46747. Joined on 27 Nov 1865, and left on 8 Feb 1892. Last posted to D Division as a PC.
- Edwin Reeves, warrant number 46829. Joined on 18 Dec 1865, and left on 8 Feb 1892. Last posted to E Division as a PC.
- Edwin William Reeves, warrant number 46905. Joined on 8 Jan 1866, and left on 8 Feb 1892. Last posted to Y Division as a PS.
- Philip Fuller, warrant number 47687. Joined on 29 Oct 1866, and left on 8 Feb 1892. Last posted to N Division as Inspector.
- James Box, warrant number 47863. Joined on 10 Dec 1866, and left on 8 Feb 1892. Last posted to TA Division as a PC.
|