Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- Charles Lincoln, warrant number 43675. Joined on 9 Feb 1863, and left on 1 May 1891. Last posted to R Division as a PC.
- James McIntosh, warrant number 43969. Joined on 1 June 1863, and left on 1 May 1891. Last posted to D Division as Inspector.
- Jos Rosengrave, warrant number 45218. Joined on 5 Sept 1864, and left on 1 May 1891. Last posted to P Division as a PC.
- George Fry, warrant number 45469. Joined on 21 Nov 1864, and left on 1 May 1891. Last posted to P Division as a Sub Inspector.
- George Furnell, warrant number 45565. Joined on 12 Dec 1864, and left on 1 May 1891. Last posted to P Division as a PC.
- Thomas John Tory, warrant number 76408. Joined on 8 Dec 1890, and left on 1 May 1891. Last posted to M Division as a PC.
- Henry Hawkins, warrant number 43164. Joined on 5 Dec 1860, and left on 2 May 1891. Last posted to H Division as a PC.
- William Smith, warrant number 44872. Joined on 9 May 1864, and left on 2 May 1891. Last posted to R Division as a PS.
- James Jeal, warrant number 45120. Joined on 8 Aug 1864, and left on 2 May 1891. Last posted to D Division as a PC.
- Luke Peers, warrant number 45346. Joined on 17 Oct 1864, and left on 2 May 1891. Last posted to N Division as a PC.
- Thomas Dunkason, warrant number 45742. Joined on 6 Feb 1865, and left on 2 May 1891. Last posted to D Division as a PC.
- Samuel James Castle, warrant number 45896. Joined on 3 April 1865, and left on 2 May 1891. Last posted to R Division as Inspector.
- Daniel Cooke, warrant number 53228. Joined on 19 Sept 1870, and left on 2 May 1891. Last posted to D Division as a PC.
- Charles Summerfield, warrant number 74168. Joined on 7 Jan 1889, and left on 2 May 1891. Last posted to H Division as a PC.
- James Jos Aiton, warrant number 75602. Joined on 21 April 1890, and left on 26 April 1891. Last posted to R Division as a PC.
- Lewis Brooks, warrant number 65499. Joined on 28 March 1881, and left on 27 April 1891. Last posted to F Division as a PC.
- John Thomas Lenton, warrant number 70487. Joined on 13 April 1885, and left on 30 April 1891. Last posted to L Division as a PC.
|