Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- Jesse Wooller, warrant number 56735. Joined on 21 April 1873, and left on 16 July 1890. Last posted to A Division as a PC.
- William Noton, warrant number 56963. Joined on 16 June 1873, and left on 17 July 1890. Last posted to P Division as a PC.
- James G Bremner, warrant number 67782. Joined on 16 April 1883, and left on 17 July 1890. Last posted to CO Division as a PS.
- Thomas Beevers, warrant number 73789. Joined on 16 July 1888, and left on 17 July 1890. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- Charles B Lemar, warrant number 75298. Joined on 24 Feb 1890, and left on 17 July 1890. Last posted to T Division as a PC.
- John W Ireland, warrant number 70201. Joined on 23 Feb 1885, and left on 21 July 1890. Last posted to E Division as a PC.
- Isaac Thomas Curtis, warrant number 70686. Joined on 11 May 1885, and left on 21 July 1890. Last posted to R Division as a PC.
- Alfred Kendall, warrant number 70760. Joined on 1 June 1885, and left on 21 July 1890. Last posted to M Division as a PC.
- William John Smith, warrant number 73929. Joined on 27 Aug 1888, and left on 21 July 1890. Last posted to C Division as a PC.
- John Golding, warrant number 59735. Joined on 13 Dec 1875, and left on 22 July 1890. Last posted to M Division as a PC.
- Henry Charles Ellis, warrant number 74418. Joined on 22 April 1889, and left on 23 July 1890. Last posted to R Division as a PC.
- Alexander Perry, warrant number 71586. Joined on 26 April 1886, and left on 24 July 1890. Last posted to K Division as a PC.
- Isaac Warf, warrant number 74016. Joined on 26 Nov 1888, and left on 24 July 1890. Last posted to C Division as a PC.
- Henry P Williams, warrant number 74977. Joined on 2 Dec 1889, and left on 24 July 1890. Last posted to E Division as a PC.
- Walter H Jarivs, warrant number 75478. Joined on 24 March 1890, and left on 24 July 1890. Last posted to E Division as a PC.
- William James Pasher, warrant number 60454. Joined on 5 June 1876, and left on 25 July 1890. Last posted to H Division as a PC.
- John Phillips, warrant number 67548. Joined on 5 March 1883, and left on 26 July 1890. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
|