Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- Alfred Knapp, warrant number 70835. Joined on 15 June 1885, and left on 1 June 1889. Last posted to CO Division as a PC.
- Walter J Smith, warrant number 73029. Joined on 12 Dec 1887, and left on 1 June 1889. Last posted to M Division as a PC.
- Herbert E Self, warrant number 49926. Joined on 16 March 1868, and left on 4 June 1889. Last posted to J Division as a PC.
- Jesse Morling Emeny, warrant number 51773. Joined on 24 May 1869, and left on 4 June 1889. Last posted to K Division as a PC.
- William Turner, warrant number 57040. Joined on 7 July 1873, and left on 4 June 1889. Last posted to M Division as a PC.
- Scipio SG Nocentini, warrant number 73471. Joined on 5 March 1888, and left on 4 June 1889. Last posted to C Division as a PC.
- Christopher G Watkins, warrant number 74107. Joined on 17 Dec 1888, and left on 4 June 1889. Last posted to C Division as a PC.
- William Waters, warrant number 43794. Joined on 23 March 1863, and left on 28 May 1889. Last posted to Chatham [Dockyard] as Inspector.
- Ephraim Feasey, warrant number 50797. Joined on 20 July 1868, and left on 28 May 1889. Last posted to P Division as a PC.
- George Long, warrant number 51276. Joined on 23 Nov 1868, and left on 28 May 1889. Last posted to L Division as a PC.
- William T Wall, warrant number 55507. Joined on 17 June 1872, and left on 28 May 1889. Last posted to W Division as a PC.
- Harry Riddle, warrant number 74059. Joined on 10 Dec 1888, and left on 29 May 1889. Last posted to TA Division as a PC.
- Walter T Gosney, warrant number 74163. Joined on 7 Jan 1889, and left on 29 May 1889. Last posted to B Division as a PC.
- Smart Dunthorne, warrant number 67568. Joined on 19 March 1883, and left on 30 May 1889. Last posted to D Division as a PC.
- John Gallagher, warrant number 68976. Joined on 3 March 1884, and left on 30 May 1889. Last posted to K Division as a PC.
- Abraham Moles, warrant number 45307. Joined on 3 Oct 1864, and left on 31 May 1889. Last posted to R Division as a Sub Inspector.
- Peter Goodchild, warrant number 45631. Joined on 27 Dec 1868, and left on 31 May 1889. Last posted to F Division as a PC.
- Charles Brown, warrant number 45971. Joined on 17 April 1865, and left on 31 May 1889. Last posted to F Division as a PC.
|