Description: |
Register of leavers from the Metropolitan Police, as follows:
- George Hayden, warrant number 74817. Joined on 7 Oct 1889, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to A Division as a PC.
- John Franklin Bloomfield, warrant number 75741. Joined on 12 May 1890, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to A Division as a PC.
- Samuel Henry Christmas, warrant number 76247. Joined on 6 Oct 1890, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to Portsmouth [Dockyard] as a Station PS.
- Thomas Hanaford, warrant number 76376. Joined on 1 Dec 1890, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to S Division as a PC.
- William Leonard, warrant number 76380. Joined on 1 Dec 1890, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to Devonport [Dockyard] as a PC.
- Joseph Francis Rockett, warrant number 76384. Joined on 1 Dec 1890, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to A Division as a PC.
- James Ashman, warrant number 76878. Joined on 22 June 1891, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to A Division as a PC.
- Thomas William Bristow, warrant number 76986. Joined on 10 Aug 1891, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to B Division as a PC.
- Alfred Tester, warrant number 77201. Joined on 30 Nov 1891, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to Y Division as a PC.
- Simon Trundle, warrant number 77206. Joined on 30 Nov 1891, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to W Division as a PC.
- Thomas Whiting Bedwell, warrant number 77216. Joined on 30 Nov 1891, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to K Division as a PC.
- Francis Henry Dredge, warrant number 77230. Joined on 7 Dec 1891, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to A Division as a PC.
- Alfred William Chapman, warrant number 77277. Joined on 21 Dec 1891, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to Portsmouth [Dockyard] as a PC.
- Morgan Lloyd, warrant number 77281. Joined on 21 Dec 1891, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to X Division as a PC.
- William George Dunkley, warrant number 77321. Joined on 4 Jan 1892, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to B Division as a PC.
- Charles James Gason, warrant number 77333. Joined on 4 Jan 1892, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to R Division as Acting PS.
- William James Miliham, warrant number 77623. Joined on 2 May 1892, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to D Division as a PC.
- Richard William Wood, warrant number 77740. Joined on 13 June 1892, and left on 15 Sept 1919. Last posted to A Division as a PC.
|